Love et al v. Home Depot USA Inc
Plaintiff: Donald Love, Robert Plunk, Katie M Pullins, Terrence Taylor, Thomas J Lynch, Marie Ann Anderson, Raymond J Black, Sr, Ronald B Bobson, James Alan Bowley, Ervin Dale Britton, Terry Lee Descardo, Tarsha Adam Felton, Shannon Fleischman, Carl Gardner, Stephen Garraway, Todd Martin Giammo, Kenneth Harpley, Lorry Isenstein, Danny Larosa, David R Messing, Michael J Moers, Marybeth Munroe, Terry M Nichols, Jeffrey Schwerdtfeger, Anthony E Vitale, Daniel E Wheatley, Shane Wong, Shirley Avery, Robert Michael Brassfield, Jason Allen Chastain, Kimberlee J Greenfield, Donald E Patterson, Gregory James Pitts, Bernard L Stringfellow, Richard Wentz, John D Todd, Cathey Cordell, Jermanic Carey, Carmen Y Cabrera, William Richards, Mark A Simmons, Charles Moore, Jason Paul Whitmore, Martha F Cantrell, Patrick David Cramer, Lane Bradley Creswell, Fidel Santiago, Edward Wilson Haikanis, Brent Hayes, Reinhard Jaensch, Esua Leal, Piotr G Maronski, Joseph Michael Quartaro, Barbara A Ramirez, Corey Rickman, Gerald P Russell, Jr, Kesa Wilson, Thomas David Winter, Robert William Howard, Anthony S Gordon, Scott Heide, Phi Nguyen, Matthew G Simmons, Frank E Simmons, Jr, Walton J Sullivan, Jr and Scott L Zacher
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00485
Filed: June 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER pursuant to 31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to the claims of Separate Plaintiffs Marie Ann Anderson, Raymond Black, Sr., James Bowley, Robert M. Brassfield, Carmen Cabera, Cathey Cordell, P atrick Cramer, Shannon Fleischman, Carl Gardner, Todd M. Giammo, Kimberlee Greenfield, Edward Haikanis, Brent Hayes, Lorry Isenstein, Donald Love, Michael Moers, Phi Nguyen, Donald Patterson, Joseph Quartaro, William Richards, Jeffrey Schwerdtfeger, Bernard Stringfellow, Walton Sullivan, Robert William Howard, Kesa Wilson and Scott Zacher. Each party will bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 03/29/2013. (jak)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/5/13. (kpr)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice pursuant to the 26 stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/27/2013. (dmn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love et al v. Home Depot USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Love
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Plunk
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie M Pullins
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Taylor
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J Lynch
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Ann Anderson
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond J Black, Sr
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald B Bobson
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Alan Bowley
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin Dale Britton
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Lee Descardo
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarsha Adam Felton
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Fleischman
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Gardner
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Garraway
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Martin Giammo
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Harpley
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorry Isenstein
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Larosa
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R Messing
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Moers
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marybeth Munroe
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry M Nichols
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Schwerdtfeger
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony E Vitale
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel E Wheatley
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Wong
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Avery
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Michael Brassfield
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Allen Chastain
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberlee J Greenfield
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E Patterson
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory James Pitts
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard L Stringfellow
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wentz
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Todd
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathey Cordell
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermanic Carey
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Y Cabrera
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Richards
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A Simmons
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Moore
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Paul Whitmore
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha F Cantrell
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick David Cramer
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lane Bradley Creswell
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidel Santiago
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Wilson Haikanis
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Hayes
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reinhard Jaensch
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esua Leal
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piotr G Maronski
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Michael Quartaro
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A Ramirez
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Rickman
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald P Russell, Jr
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kesa Wilson
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas David Winter
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert William Howard
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony S Gordon
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Heide
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phi Nguyen
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew G Simmons
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank E Simmons, Jr
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walton J Sullivan, Jr
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott L Zacher
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan Brad Moore
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?