Morton et al v. Luken et al

Plaintiff: Larry E Morton and Retro Television Network Inc
Defendant: Henry G Luken, III, Luken Communications LLC and Retro Television Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00489
Filed: June 16, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting defts' 30 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, for a total award of $46,795.00 in attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $535.44. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/2/12. (vjt)
February 14, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing pltfs up to and including 2/24/12 to supplement their response to defts' 30 MOTION for Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/14/12. (vjt)
January 23, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltfs' request for a 10 day extension of time to respond to defts' 30 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/23/12. (vjt)
January 5, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 27 Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/5/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morton et al v. Luken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry E Morton
Represented By: Byron S. Southern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retro Television Network Inc
Represented By: Byron S. Southern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry G Luken, III
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Represented By: John Peyton Perkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luken Communications LLC
Represented By: John Peyton Perkins, III
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retro Television Inc
Represented By: John Peyton Perkins, III
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?