Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Cochran

Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Angela K Cochran
Case Number: 4:2011cv00521
Filed: June 28, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Motion for Default Judgment. It is therefore ordered and adjudged that defendant Angela K. Cochran has no right, claim, or interest in the $20,000 benefit described in plai ntiffs verified complaint. It is further ordered and adjudged that plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company may withdraw or exercise control over the $20,000 benefit from the Total Control Account as it continues to search for the proper beneficiary, and may withdraw and cancel the surety bond filed on 6/29/11. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/2/11. (hph)
July 11, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION enjoining the defendant from withdrawing, dissipating, transferring, or otherwise accessing the funds held in the TCA which represent the benefit payable as the result of the death of Michael Eugene Cochran, including interest; and, ordering Metlife to serve a file-marked copy of this preliminary injunction upon defendant. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/11/2011. (kdr)
June 28, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. A hearing on MetLife's motion for preliminary injunction will be held on Friday, July 8, 2011, at 11:00 a.m. in Room 2D of the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 500 W. Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Ar kansas. MetLife's proffered $5,000 surety bond is approved, and MetLife is directed to file the bond with the clerk's office. MetLife is further directed to serve a file-marked copy of this order forthwith upon deft Angela K. Cochran. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/28/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spillyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela K Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?