Pearson et al v. Pulaski County Special School District

Plaintiff: DeeVee Pearson and Mark Pearson
Defendant: Pulaski County Special School District
Case Number: 4:2011cv00538
Filed: June 30, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Costs; granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court awards plaintiffs' costs of $400.00 and attorney's fees of $10,800.00, for a total award to plaintiffs of $11,200.00. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/13. (kpr)
January 29, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the Court's 31 Opinion and Order of 1/25/2013, judgment is entered against the defendant for $12,500.00. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/29/2013. (dmn)
May 11, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information 8 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/11/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson et al v. Pulaski County Special School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeeVee Pearson
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Pearson
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Special School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?