Pledger v. Anderson

Defendant: Marty Anderson
Petitioner: William Pledger, III
Case Number: 4:2011cv00559
Filed: July 7, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to 60 Order entered on 10/03/2013. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 07/14/2014. (rhm)
December 9, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the petition and this Order on the respondent and the U.S. Attorney by regular mail. The respondent is directed to answer within 20 days after service of this petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/9/11. (kpr)
July 13, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward to petitioner an application to proceed ifp. Within 30 days of the entry of this order, petitioner must either pay the $5.00 statutory filing fee in full, or file a properly completed application to proceed ifp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/13/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pledger v. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Pledger, III
Represented By: Michelle Nahon Moulder
Represented By: David R. Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Anderson
Represented By: Cynthia J. Hyde
Represented By: Joseph McGuire
Represented By: Christina Leigh Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?