Richards v. Stewart

Plaintiff: Martin Richards
Defendant: Gary Stewart
Case Number: 4:2011cv00590
Filed: July 28, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 43 Memorandum and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/12/12. (vjt)
December 8, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 29 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/8/11. (kpr)
October 26, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/26/11. (kpr)
October 4, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 14 Answer. Deft Dr. Garry Stewart has supplied his correct name. The Clerk is directed to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of this deft. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/4/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards v. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?