Hopson v. Beebe et al

Plaintiff: Charles Hopson
Defendant: Mike Beebe, Tom Kimbrell, Jerry Guess and Does
Case Number: 4:2011cv00608
Filed: August 5, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 31, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT conveying that this case has settled. Hopson's remaining claims against PCSSD are dismissed with prejudice. All other claims are dismissed as specified in the Court's prior Orders, 45 & 74 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/31/2013. (jak)
October 30, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re trial date 109 . The Court made a mistake about its schedule. The trial will start on Tuesday, January 7, 2014, at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/30/13. (kpr)
October 29, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Rickey H. Hicks to bring certain electronics into the Courthouse on October 29, 2013 (and until trial ends). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/29/13. (kpr)
October 17, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notes parties' 98 92 93 Pretrial Disclosure Sheets. The Clerk is directed to correct the docket to reflect 96 MOTION for Trial bench filed by Charles Hopson, Patricia Hopson to be an amendment to Hopson's trial brief 95 , not a motion. The Court will hold a pretrial hearing on October 29, 2013, at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/17/13. (kpr)
September 16, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 78 PCSSD's Motion for Summary Judgment and directing the parties to brief whether the claim should be tried by a jury or the Court in their trial briefs due on 10/15/2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/16/2013. (thd)
June 20, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying PCSSD's 51 Motion to Dismiss based on untimely substitution; granting Dr. Kimbrell's 53 Motion to Dismiss; granting Dr. Kimbrell's 63 Motion to Dismiss Dr. Hopson's remaining procedural-due-process claim a gainst him with prejudice; dismissing Dr. Kimbrell as a defendant; and granting 60 Motion to Substitute Patricia Hopson as Executrix for Charles Hopson as plaintiff. Patricia Hopson added. The Court requests the Honorable Joe J. Volpe to hold a settlement conference soon. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/20/13. (kpr)
September 12, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss. The discovery stay is lifted. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/12/12. (kpr)
August 28, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Cynthia Howell to bring an audio recording device into the courthouse for the hearing in this case on August 29, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/28/12. (kpr)
March 6, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER suspending 31 Scheduling Order; and granting 33 MOTION to Extend ddls filed by Charles Hopson. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/6/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopson v. Beebe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hopson
Represented By: David O. Bowden
Represented By: Rickey H. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Kimbrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Guess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?