Eckardt v. Hewlett-Packard Company

Plaintiff: Betsy Eckardt
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv00630
Filed: August 16, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Joint Motion to Dismiss and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/27/12. (kpr)
September 22, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion to Dismiss the sex discrimination and retaliation claims in Counts 5 and 6. Plaintiff should file an amended complaint no later than 5 p.m., Thursday, October 6, 2011. Deft may file an answer to the amended complaint within 14 days of the filing of the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/22/11. (kpr)
September 13, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion for Limited Admission filed by Edward M. Fox and Julie O. Herrera. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/13/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckardt v. Hewlett-Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy Eckardt
Represented By: Mary M. Dryovage
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Edward Mark Fox
Represented By: Julie O Herrera
Represented By: Julie M. Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Represented By: Heather Murray Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?