Pulley v. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated

Plaintiff: Dwight Pulley
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2011cv00634
Filed: August 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of UnitedHealth Group Incorporated against Dwight Pulley re 82 Order granting Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/10/13. (kpr)
April 19, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 65 Motion for Issuance of subpoenas without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send to Mr. Pulley a copy of this Order, as well as five signed, but otherwise blank, supoenas on the form titled Subpoena to Appear and T estify at a Hearing or a Trial in a Civil Action (Form No. AO-88). Once completed, Mr. Pulley should submit these subpoenas to the Clerk of the Court no later than 5 p.m. on Monday, May 13, 2013, and should file a notice with this Court that he has done so. When Mr. Pulley submits the completed subpoenas to the Clerk of the Court, the Clerk should transmit them to the U.S. Marshal's Service, and the Marshal's Service should serve the subpoenas in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/19/13. (kpr)
July 25, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion to Compel. If the parties cannot agree by 5 p.m., Monday, July 30, 2012, on a date, time and location for Mr. Pulley's deposition, they are directed to provide the Court will all available dates and times between the date of this Order and August 20, 2012, including, but not limited to, Saturdays. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/25/12. (kpr)
July 2, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 54 Motion for Reconsideration re 36 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/2/12. (kpr)
February 3, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 MOTION of Byron J. Walker to Withdraw as appointed counsel for pltf; appointing Ralph M. Washington to represent pltf in all further proceedings; the Clerk is directed to send pltf and counsel a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/3/12. (vjt)
January 13, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 MOTION of J. Todd Jones to Withdraw as appointed counsel for pltf Dwight Pulley; appointing Byron J. Walker to represent pltf in all further proceedings; the Clerk is directed to send pltf and counsel a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/13/12. (vjt)
October 13, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motions for Special Appearance of Kyle A. Petersen 17 and Joseph S. Turner 18 as co-counsel in this action for deft. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/13/11. (vjt)
August 30, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pro se pltf to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; the Clerk is directed to serve this Order on pltf by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/30/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pulley v. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle A. Petersen
Represented By: Joseph S. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Pulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?