Terra Renewal LLC v. McCarthy et al

Plaintiff: Terra Renewal LLC
Defendant: Daniel McCarthy and Lakeside Capital Development LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv00653
Filed: August 26, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pope
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the 33 Order entered 7/10/2012, judgment is hereby entered against Daniel McCarthy, Individually and in his official capacity as President of Hartland Capital Development d/b/a Midwest Equipment Leasing and Hartland Capital Development, LLC f/k/a Lakeside Capital Development, LLC. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/24/2012. (dmn)
August 3, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding plaintiff $18,540 in attorney's fees and $995.88 in costs, for a total of $19,535.88. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/3/12. (kpr)
July 10, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion for Default Judgment for the plaintiff in the amount of $96,250 in compensatory damages, and $3,000 in punitive damages. Plaintiff is awarded prejudgment interest on $16,250 and $80,000 from the time of the loss until judgment at the highest rate allowed by Arkansas law, or 6%. Plaintiff is awarded post-judgment interest which will accrue at the rate of.20% per annum until the judgment is satisfied. Plaintiff is entitled to an award of costs and attorney's fees and is directed to submit a motion within 10 business days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/10/12. (kpr)
January 13, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER continuing the default judgment motion hearing currently set for January 17, 2012. The hearing is continued until 1:30 p.m., Thursday, February 2, 2012, for the parties to provide the Court with the additional information set forth in this Order. This information should be provided by 5:00 p.m., Thursday, January 26, 2012. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/13/12. (kpr)
December 20, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 14 Alternative Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/20/11. (kpr)
October 25, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 MOTION for Default Judgment directing deft to respond to pltf's motion by 5 p.m. on Friday, November 5, 2011; otherwise, a hearing will be scheduled to determine the amount in which default judgment should be entered. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this letter to Mr. McCarthy at the address shown above. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/25/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terra Renewal LLC v. McCarthy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terra Renewal LLC
Represented By: Vanessa Kinney
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeside Capital Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?