Michalek v. Lunsford et al

Plaintiff: Brian Judah Michalek
Defendant: Patrick Lunsford and Bruce Pennington
Case Number: 4:2011cv00685
Filed: September 15, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Denying, 53 Defendants' Renewed Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, without prejudice to Defendants' refiling that motion within the deadlines specified in the Final Sc heduling Order. A Final Scheduling Order will be entered, setting new discovery and motions deadlines, and a trial date. All deadlines in the Final Scheduling Order are immutable. Any future request by counsel to change any of those deadlines will be summarily denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/19/2014. (kcs)
February 4, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the parties have jointly requested, by telephone, an extension of deadlines. The parties are directed to complete discovery on or before 3/22/2013; Plaintiff file his Amended Complaint on or before 3/22/2013; and the parties are directed to file any dispositive motions on or before 4/22/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/04/2013. (kcs)
August 24, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that by previous Orders, the Court has denied Defendants' Motion for Summary Summary therefore, the Court directs the parties to complete discovery on or before 12/21/2012 and file any dispositive motions by 2/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/24/2012. (kcs)
April 24, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 43 and denying 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims may proceed. Counsel will be appointed to represent him by separate Order. The case will be removed from the trial docket the week of May 14, 2012. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/24/12. (kpr)
January 27, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff is directed to file, within 30 days of the entry of this Order, a Response to 33 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment of Patrick Lunsford & Sheriff Bruce Pennington, filed by Bruce Pennington, 35 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) and 34 Brief in Support filed by Bruce Pennington. Failure to timely file and comply with this order may result in all the facts set forth in the Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff or the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/27/2012. (kcs)
January 23, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, because no videotape or other recording of the alleged incident exists, 21 MOTION for Discovery filed by Brian Judah Michalek is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/23/2012. (kcs)
October 19, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the pro se plaintiff to be familiar and comply with all Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/19/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michalek v. Lunsford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Judah Michalek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Lunsford
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Pennington
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Represented By: Frederick S. Ursery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?