J & J Sports Productions Inc v. Patterson et al

Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions Inc
Defendant: Dena M Patterson and Brewster 2 Cafe LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv00690
Filed: September 16, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:521 Communications Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 61 Opinion and Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that judgment be entered in favor of J & J Sports Productions, Inc. in the amount of $8,800.00. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/2/2014. (ks)
June 9, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Josh E. McHughes terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/9/2014. (jak)
November 22, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Set Aside Default and 32 on to Set Aside Judgment 29 . Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/22/13. (kpr)
May 13, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Default Judgment. The Court finds that plaintiff's requested damages in the amount of $50,000 is indefinite or uncertain and that plaintiff's damages must be proved in a hearing. The Court will schedule that hearing by separate Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/13/13. (kpr)
April 3, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 4 Order on Motion to Extend Time. The Court orders that plaintiff file proof of service on Dena M. Patterson no later than April 15, 2013. The Court further orders that plaintiff file a status report on this action no later than April 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/3/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions Inc v. Patterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions Inc
Represented By: Becky A. McHughes
Represented By: Josh E. McHughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dena M Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brewster 2 Cafe LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?