Burton v. Martin et al

Plaintiff: Richard A Burton
Defendant: Mark Martin, Darrell S Hedden and Arkansas Secretary of State
Case Number: 4:2011cv00710
Filed: September 28, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 78 defendants' second motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 02/13/2015. (rhm)
March 10, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re 67 USCA Opinion Mr. Burton's 1983 equal protection retaliation claim against Chief Hedden in his in individual capacity is dismissed with prejudice. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will be issued by separate Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/10/2014. (mmd)
February 20, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this case from the Court's trial calendar for February 25, 2013. A new trial date and scheduling ddls will be entered following issuance of the mandate by the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/20/13. (kpr)
February 16, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/16/13. (jlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A Burton
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell S Hedden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?