Carson v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Carson
Defendant: Hosea Thompson and Elnora Thompson
Case Number: 4:2011cv00733
Filed: October 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 49 Order entered today, Carson's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/11/2012. (dmn)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER setting ddl for briefs answering the Court's three questions until 10/19/12. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/24/12. (kpr)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 37 Motion for Sanctions; denying 38 Motion for Sanctions. Hosea Thompson's verified responses to prior interrogs due by 9/29/12. The parties must file simultaneous briefs by 10/3/12. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/20/12. (kpr)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER setting a status conference for 10:00 a.m. on Wednesday, 9/19/12, in courtroom B-155 of the Richard S. Arnold U.S. Courthouse in Little Rock, AR. The Court orders Arthur Carson, Elnora Thompson, and Hosea Thompson to appear at the conference. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/16/12. (kpr) Modified on 8/16/2012 to corrrect typographical error (kpr).
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 33 Motion for Sanctions; granting 34 Motion to Compel. Elnora Thompson is directed to respond to Carson's interrogs no later than July 23, 2012. These responses should be sent directly to Carson, not filed by the Court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/11/12. (kpr)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 27 MOTION to Compel filed by Arthur Carson. The Court directs Carson to supplement his motion with a copy of the interrogatories by May 25, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/17/12. (kpr)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 23 Motion for Issuance. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/28/12. (kpr)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that deft Elnora Thompson's answer is due 2/20/2012; directing pltf to file an itemization of all his claimed damages by 2/20/12. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/20/12. (vjt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carson v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hosea Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elnora Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?