McCall v. Sanders et al

Plaintiff: Jamie Shawn McCall
Defendant: Coti Sanders and Steve Pinnington
Case Number: 4:2011cv00745
Filed: October 13, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying, as moot, 66 Plaintiff's Fourth Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/19/2012. (kcs)
August 29, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Defendants' Motion to Compel. The Plaintiff is directed to file his Answers to Defendants' 7/3/2012 Interrogatories within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/29/2012. (kcs)
June 8, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel and denying 49 which the Court has construed as a Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/08/2012. (kcs)
May 30, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Defendants' Motion to Compel; denying 45 Plaintiff's Motion to Depose By Written Questions, Mr. Anthony Banks; denying 46 Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/30/2012. (kcs)
December 16, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve defts Pennington and Sanders; dismissing defts Henson and Gaines; directing the Clerk to docket deft's Amended Complaint, which was previously filed as Objections to the Recommended Disposition; and certifying that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/16/11. (kpr)
November 4, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining the 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and referring the case back to Judge Ray to screen McCall's proposed complaint and make a recommendation on t he embedded motion to amend. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/4/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Sanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coti Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Pinnington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Shawn McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?