Collins v. Seeco Inc et al

Plaintiff: Rodney D Collins
Defendant: Seeco Inc, Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Southwestern Energy Production Company, Southwestern Energy Company and Southwestern Energy Services Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv00761
Filed: October 19, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Conway
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 35 Order dismissing the complaint without prejudice. All parties will bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/16/12. (kpr)
June 18, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER mostly denying 6 Motion to Dismiss but granting in part with leave to amend. The Amended Complaint is due June 29, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/15/12. (kpr)
May 16, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/16/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Seeco Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seeco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desoto Gathering Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Energy Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Energy Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Energy Services Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney D Collins
Represented By: Keith L. Grayson
Represented By: Charles R. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?