Anderson v. Metropolitan National Bank

Plaintiff: Don Anderson
Defendant: Metropolitan National Bank
Case Number: 4:2011cv00777
Filed: October 27, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice pursuant to the 8 Stipulation filed by the parties; each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/14/11. (vjt)
November 23, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Metropolitan National Bank answer due 12/15/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/23/11. (vjt)
November 1, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Michael Todd Harrison to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for pltf in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/1/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Metropolitan National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Odell Turner
Represented By: Michael Todd Harrison
Represented By: Todd Martin Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan National Bank
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?