Robinson v. United Parcel Service Inc

Plaintiff: Coby D Robinson
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00784
Filed: October 31, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to the parties' 49 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/25/13. (kpr) (Docket entry modified on 7/26/2013 to establish linkage.) (thd).
February 14, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part UPS's 38 Motion to Dismiss. The Motion to Dismiss the claim under the Family Medical Leave Act is denied. The Motion to Dismiss as it pertains to Robinson's claim under § 301 of the Labor Management Relations Act and his state-law breach-of-contract claim is granted.Those claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/14/2013. (mcz)
September 24, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects 19 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/24/2012. (dmn) (Docket entry modified on 9/25/2012 to correct the file date.) (thd).
July 17, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is directed to provide Defendant with its initial disclosures, as well as responses to Defendant's discovery requests, by 5:00 p.m., Wednesday, July 18, 2012. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/17/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. United Parcel Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coby D Robinson
Represented By: R. Keith Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc
Represented By: Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?