Coker v. Arkansas State Police et al

Plaintiff: Gabriel M Coker
Defendant: Arkansas State Police and Brad Cartwright
Case Number: 4:2011cv00867
Filed: December 6, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2015 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to exchange copies of all proposed exhibits and final witness lists by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, 5 February 2015. Please deliver copies to chambers by then too. The Court will convene at 9:00 Monday morning, 9 February 2015, to handle any remaining evidentiary issues, including exhibits. The venire will arrive at 12:30 p.m. The internal investigation itself will not be tried because it's not relevant and would confuse the jury on the questions it must answer. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/2/2015. (jak)
January 30, 2015 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 103 Motion for Reconsideration or in limine. The Court would appreciate an expedited response to 104 Motion from Coker by Monday, 2 February 2015. On assault and battery: the Court is not going to instruct the jury on these unpleaded claims; to try them would offend the Court of Appeals' mandate. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/30/2015. (jak)
January 27, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding potential punitive damages. Having reflected further and re-read the applicable cases, the Court is convinced that it made a mistake on this issue. The Court concludes Cartwright had enough notice. The Court is convinced that it would be error in the circumstances, based on Bowles, to bar Coker from trying to make a submissible case for an award of exemplary damages. His oral motion to amend his complaint, made at the end of the 22 January 2015 pretrial, is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/27/2015. (jak)
January 23, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified Coker's motion in limine, 86 . Coker's motion to compel, 35 , is denied as moot based on Cartwright's production of the partial recording. The request for a spoliation instruction is denied for the reasons stated. Cartwright's motion in limine, 83 , is granted with a few exceptions. Cartwright's motion in limine is denied as to any statement Cartwright made, including statements made during the internal affairs investigation. The Court continues to work on the punitive damages issue. Any additional filing from any party on any pretrial issue must be made as soon as possible and no later than 29 January 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/2015. (jak)
October 12, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to Order 49 , dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/12/2012. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coker v. Arkansas State Police et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel M Coker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State Police
Represented By: Sherri L. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Cartwright
Represented By: Sherri L. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?