Bunch v. University of Arkansas Board of Trustees

Plaintiff: Gloria A Bunch
Defendant: University of Arkansas Board of Trustees
Case Number: 4:2011cv00869
Filed: December 7, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Plaintiff shall have 45 days from the date of this Order to respond to defendant's 49 motion to compel. A separate Order will follow resetting all other deadlines. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/07/2014. (mmd)
October 22, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 Motion to Seal. The brief may be filed under seal with the Clerk. The court will defer ruling on the motion to withdraw until it has had an opportunity to review the brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/22/13. (kpr)
April 4, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Ms. Bunch's requests, as set forth in this Order. Attorney Donna S. Galchus for Gloria A Bunch added. Attorney Larry W. Burks terminated.Ms. Bunch's motion to oppose motion for summary judgment is denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to send Ms. Bunch and Ms. Galchus via certified mail a copy of this Order and a copy of Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/4/13. (kpr)
November 27, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER confirming the Court's rulings in the 43 Telephone Conference held 11/26/12. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the plaintiff at her address of record, by certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/27/12. (kpr)
September 25, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting 30 Motion to Clarify. The Court amends its original Order in that Ms. Bunch is not entitled to file additional objections to pending discovery requests, as the time to object has passed. Plaintiff is directed to confer with defendant and file a status report with the Court 25 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/25/12. (kpr) Modified on 9/25/2012 (kpr).
February 29, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 Order. The Clerk is directed to prepare the summons and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons and complaint on the deft without prepayment of fees therefor. Plaintiff should be familiar and comply with the Local Rules of this Court, as well as the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/29/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunch v. University of Arkansas Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria A Bunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?