Dewitt v. Securitas Security Services USA Inc et al

Plaintiff: Connie Dewitt
Defendant: Securitas Security Services USA Inc and Securitas Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00873
Filed: December 8, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 38 Order dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/30/12. (kpr)
November 16, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION: Re 32 Joint Motion, The Court intends to give final approval and unseal the settlement documents promptly on 30 November 2012 unless the parties advise the Court before then that making the details public means there is no settlement and the cases should therefore stay on the docket for adjudication. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/16/2012. (mcz)
May 23, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion to Certify Class without prejudice as to an Arkansas-related collective action and otherwise denied with prejudice; finding as moot 24 Motion for Leave to File; granting 25 Motion for Leave to File; granting 26 Motion to Extend Time for filing Rule 26(f) report until June 8, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/23/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dewitt v. Securitas Security Services USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securitas Security Services USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securitas Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Dewitt
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?