Reed v. Arkansas Children's Hospital et al

Plaintiff: Tara Reed
Defendant: Arkansas Children's Hospital and Justain Williams
Case Number: 4:2011cv00891
Filed: December 16, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 36 Order entered on this day, it is Considered, Ordered, and Adjudged that this complaint be, and it is hereby, dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/11/2012. (dmn)
April 10, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for deft Justain Williams, and the U.S. Marshal Service is directed to serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on Mr. Williams at 11413 Jamestown Drive, Little Rock, AR 72211, without prepayment of fees. Pltf must be familiar and comply with Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/10/12. (kpr)
February 13, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing party Danny O'Kelly. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/13/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Arkansas Children's Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Children's Hospital
Represented By: Daniel Lee Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justain Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?