Rogers v. American Red Cross

Plaintiff: Malcolm R Rogers
Defendant: American Red Cross
Case Number: 4:2011cv00892
Filed: December 16, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 36 Order Dismissing Case without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/31/12. (kpr)
July 26, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 31 Order granting Rogers until August 1, 2012, to file his revised amended complaint. If the Court has not heard from Rogers by August 27, 2012, then it will dismiss his case without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/26/12. (kpr)
July 18, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss; denying 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting, as modified, 22 Motion to Amend/Correct. Rogers has until August 1, 2012 to revise his amended complaint and to file it with the Court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/18/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. American Red Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm R Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Red Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?