Macklin v. F M C Transport Incorporated

Plaintiff: Dennis Macklin
Defendant: F M C Transport Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2011cv00900
Filed: December 20, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 84 Order entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 01/12/2015. (rhm)
October 28, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 68 motion to compel without prejudice and providing Mr. Macklin 10 days to respond to FMC Transport's pending 63 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/28/2014. (rhm)
January 28, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Denying Defendant's 36 Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/28/2014. (mcz)
March 15, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 33 Reply filed by FMC Transport Inc, to 32 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by FMC Transport Inc, Dennis Macklin as a motion to dismiss the current action. All motions to dismiss must be accompanied by a separate brie f. FMC is directed to file a separate motion and brief raising the issues set forth in the response for the Court's consideration. The Court declines to enter a show cause order or to conduct a hearing. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/15/13. (kpr)
July 9, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Strike. The First 25 Amended Complaint is stricken. The Court denies the request to dismiss with prejudice at this time. To that extent, the Second Motion to Strike is denied. The First Amended Complaint does not comply with prior Orders of the Court, and the plaintiff must file an amended complaint that does conform by Wednesday, July 18, 2012. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/9/12. (kpr)
May 14, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Strike 17 Amended Complaint. Macklin must file a first amended complaint conforming to the Court's Order (document no. 13) by May 31, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/14/12. (kpr) Modified on 5/14/2012 to correct typographical error (jct).
April 6, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion to Dismiss; granting 8 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/6/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macklin v. F M C Transport Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F M C Transport Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Macklin
Represented By: Alvin Leonard Simes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?