James v. Dicus et al

Plaintiff: Donnie B James
Defendant: Larry Norris, Brenda Dicus, Kay Howell, Justine Minor, Randy Watson and James Gibson
Case Number: 4:2011cv00901
Filed: December 20, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 52 the recommended disposition; granting 41 defendants' motion for summary judgment; and dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. James' discrimination and retaliation claims. Jurisdiction is not exercised over James' state law claim, and it is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/11/2013. (kdr)
August 13, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 35 Motion to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions; Dispositive Motions due by 10/9/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/13/12. (vjt)
February 17, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 22 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition; allowing Plaintiff to proceed on his retaliation claim against Lieutenant Dicus and reinstating her as a party defendant; and dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's racial discrimination claim against Lieutenant Dicus. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/17/2012. (kdr)
January 24, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; dismissing Plaintiff's claim that the defendants violated multiple ADC policies with prejudice; dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's due process claim and his claim for money damages against defendants in their official capacities; and dismissing Plaintiff's claims against defendants Dicus and Walker without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/24/12. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Dicus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Dicus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justine Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie B James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?