Harper v. Postal Service (U.S.)

Plaintiff: Russel Harper
Defendant: Postal Service (U.S.)
Case Number: 4:2011cv00904
Filed: December 21, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 35 Opinion and Order that was entered on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that plaintiff Russell Harper's Title VII claims for race and gender discrimination, are dismissed with prejudice, and Mr. Harper's reasonable-accommodation and disparate-treatment claims under the Rehabilitation Act, are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/12/2013. (dmn)
July 3, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this case from the trial docket for the week of July 22, 2013. The Court has under advisement the motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 22). Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/3/13. (kpr)
January 9, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PRIVACY ACT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/9/13. (kpr)
December 12, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER Settling 13 MOTION to Compel and Motion to Extend Discovery and Motion Deadlines filed by Postal Service (U.S.), Motions terminated: 13 MOTION to Compel and Motion to Extend Discovery and Motion Deadlines filed by Postal Service (U.S.). The discovery ddl is extended until 1/31/13 and the motions ddl is extended until 3/4/13. The trial date currently set for 3/4/13 is continued, an amended scheduling order to issue. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/12/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Postal Service (U.S.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russel Harper
Represented By: Charles M. Kester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Postal Service (U.S.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?