Kolesar v. Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society et al
Plaintiff: Robert Kolesar
Defendant: Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, Good Samaritan Society Insurance Ltd, Corrine White and John Does
Case Number: 4:2011cv00915
Filed: December 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the parties' settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/15/2016. (jak)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to administratively terminate this case for reporting purposes until such time as a party files a motion to restore the case to the active docket and the Court determines that the case should be reactivated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/27/2015. (jak)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying pltf's 6 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/30/12. (vjt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kolesar v. Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kolesar
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society
Represented By: Rick T. Beard, III
Represented By: Zachary Thomas Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Samaritan Society Insurance Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrine White
Represented By: Zachary Thomas Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?