Rice v. Luken Communications LLC et al

Plaintiff: M Randy Rice
Defendant: Luken Communications LLC and Henry G Luken, III
Case Number: 4:2011mc00001
Filed: January 6, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Withdraw Reference; the reference is hereby withdrawn with respect to M. Randy Rice, as Chapter 7 Trustee v. Luken Communications LLC, and Henry G. Luken, III, USBC for the Eastern District of Arkansas, Adversary Proceedi ng No. 4:10-ap-01253; the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court and the Clerk of this Court are directed to take appropriate action to transfer the adversary proceeding to this Court where the proceeding will be docketed as a civil action and scheduled for trial by jury. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/5/11. (vjt)
March 7, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion of Scott M. DeWolf for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for pltf in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/7/11. (vjt)
February 3, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that 2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Henry G Luken, III, and Luken Communications LLC is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/3/11. (vjt)
January 28, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Gregory H. Bevel to Appear pro hac vice as special counsel in this action for pltf. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/28/11. (vjt)
January 13, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file a response to defts' 2 Demand for Jury Trial and MOTION to Withdraw Reference on or before 1/27/11; defts may file a reply within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/13/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Luken Communications LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Randy Rice
Represented By: Kerry Ann Miller
Represented By: Scott M. DeWolf
Represented By: Gregory H. Bevel
Represented By: M. Randy Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luken Communications LLC
Represented By: Allison Rantisi Gladden
Represented By: John Peyton Perkins, III
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Represented By: James E. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry G Luken, III
Represented By: Allison Rantisi Gladden
Represented By: John Peyton Perkins, III
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Represented By: James E. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?