Avery Dennison Corporation v. 3M Innovative Properties Company et al

Plaintiff: Avery Dennison Corporation
Defendant: 3M Innovative Properties Company and 3M Company
Case Number: 4:2011mc00041
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 48 Order dismissing this matter with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/14/13. (kpr)
February 7, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/7/12. (kpr)
January 9, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1 Motion to Compel. The parties should either agree on the amount and form of security or submit short briefs and supplemental information on this issue by January 23, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/9/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avery Dennison Corporation v. 3M Innovative Properties Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avery Dennison Corporation
Represented By: David Bilsker
Represented By: Jim Jackson
Represented By: Karin Kramer
Represented By: Christopher E. Stretch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Innovative Properties Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?