Linn v. Mason
Plaintiff: Kevin Linn
Defendant: Chad Mason
Case Number: 4:2012cv00004
Filed: January 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Van Buren
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 JUDGMENT in favor of Chad Mason against Kevin Linn re 92 Jury Verdict. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/6/13. (kpr)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER directing the Clerk to mail a copy of the 85 Order to Plaintiff Kevin Linn at his new address. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/29/13. (kpr)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re 75 Exhibit List filed by Kevin Linn. The Court appreciates counsel for Mason's commitment to ensure the attendance of Randy Murray and Tim Adams on the first day of trial, and thereafter until their testimony has been concluded, w ithout the necessity of a subpoena. The Court orders that they be present by 11:00 a.m. on 4 November 2013. The Court directs counsel to file under seal all known contact information for Letcher, including his last-known address and current place of employment no later than October 24, 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/23/13. (kpr) (Modified on 10/23/2013 to correct typographical error). (vjt)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the attendance of the plaintiff, Kevin Linn (ADC #119571), Cummins Unit, by 8:15 a.m. on November 4, 2013, and each day thereafter until completion of the trial. The Arkansas Department of Correction is further directed to send with Linn his legal files and papers related to this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/7/13. (kpr)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER confirming the Court's rulings from the bench at the initial pretrial conference held on October 2, 2013. Pretrial information sheet due by 10/4/13. Exhibits list due by 10/4/13. Objections to jury instructions due by 10/4/13. Both par ties shall supplement the record by filing information about Linn's parole status by 10/9/13. A final pretrial conference followed by a jury trial set for 11/4/13 at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1-A. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/3/13. (kpr)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the attendance of Plaintiff Kevin Linn, Inmate #119571, Cummins Unit, by 9:30 a.m. on October 2, 2013. The Arkansas Department of Correction is further directed to send with Linn his legal files and papers related to this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/10/13. (kpr)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER setting a pretrial conference on October 2, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. The 39 Scheduling Order is amended. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/6/13. (kpr)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER adopting 54 Partial Report and Recommendations as the Court's own. Mason's 41 Motion to Dismiss or Stay is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/7/2013. (dmn)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 41 First MOTION to Dismiss and for Costs and Alternative Motion to Stay filed by Chad Mason, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 41 First MOTION to Dismiss and for Costs and Alternative Motion to Stay.( Replies due by 4/17/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/2/13. (kpr)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER directing the plaintiff to notify the Court of his current address and his intent to continue prosecution with this action, within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/4/12. (kpr)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting the parties until on or before August 10, 2012, in which to complete discovery and up to September 10, 2012, to file any dispositive motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/13/12. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linn v. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Linn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Mason
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?