Maclin et al v. Montgomery and Sons Construction Inc et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Maclin and Ruben Tobin
Defendant: Montgomery and Sons Construction Inc, John Montgomery and Caleb Montgomery
Case Number: 4:2012cv00005
Filed: January 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 JUDGMENT re 121 Order. The plaintiffs' claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/22/13. (kpr)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 117 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement; granting 118 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/2/13. (kpr)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 100] Motion for Default Judgment with a qualification. The qualification: the Court will consider a spoliation instruction after it hears all the testimony, and sees all the witnesses, either at trial or an evidentiary hearing before trial. The Court declines to order additional notice by radio, television, and other media. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/8/13. (kpr)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 PROTECTIVE ORDER is adopted, with minor changes, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/2/13. (kpr)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER advising the parties that Judge Young will be in the courthouse and available to resolve any disputes arising during the March 7, 2013 deposition of John Montgomery. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/25/13. (kpr)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER attaching the status report from counsel for Montgomery and Sons Construction, Inc., and John Montgomery. The hearing scheduled for tomorrow will go forward, and the Court will take up the motion to withdraw at the hearing. The Court requests that in the future all counsel communicate with the Court only by filings in the docket. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/12/13. (kpr)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER requesting a joint five-page report on the discovery issues as instructed in the Final Scheduling Order 25 . The report is due by 1/10/13. The motion to compel and for sanctions is denied without prejudice. 55 The Court approves the notice and consent form. 51 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/19/12. (kpr)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Certify Class. All counsel should confer, attempt to agree on a final draft proposed notice, and file it by 12/3/2012. If agreement cannot be reached, Plaintiffs should file their proposed amended notice by that date. The Defendants will have until 12/17/2012 to object. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/15/2012. (mcz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maclin et al v. Montgomery and Sons Construction Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Maclin
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Tobin
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery and Sons Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?