Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc v. Military Capital Venture LLC

Plaintiff: Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc
Defendant: Military Capital Venture LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv00020
Filed: January 12, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT 59 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order dismissing the complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/18/13. (kpr)
July 5, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 joint report on the discovery dispute. The discovery disputes are decided by the Court and set forth in this Order. Supplemental responses to the motions for summary judgment are due July 19, 2013. The Court amends the Scheduling Order and sets the settlement conference request ddl for July 31, 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/5/13. (kpr) (ORDER VACATED PER 33 ORDER). (vjt)
February 4, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/4/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc v. Military Capital Venture LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Military Capital Venture LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?