Stuckey v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc et al

Plaintiff: Pamela Stuckey
Defendant: Larry Crane, Charles A Holiday, RD Bostic, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Clearvue Opportunity IX LLC, Mickel Law Firm PA, Heritage Service Company and Worsham Law Firm PA
Case Number: 4:2012cv00082
Filed: February 8, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 45 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice as to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, and with prejudice as to all other defts. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/13/12. (vjt)
July 30, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER if pltf wishes to pursue this action against MERS, the only remaining deft, she is directed to notify the Court no later than 8/15/12; otherwise, her complaint may be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/30/12. (vjt)
May 23, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 40 Motion for New Trial and Recusal. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/23/12. (vjt)
April 25, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 33 Motion to Strike filed by separate deft Worsham Law Firm P.A. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/25/12. (vjt)
April 9, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the County Defendants' motion to dismiss 3 , the motion for summary judgment filed by the Mickel Law Firm and Heritage Service Company 5 , ClearVue's motion to dismiss 12 , and the Worsham Law Firm's motion to dismiss 21 are GRANTED; pltf's motion for contempt 26 is denied, and the motion to strike 31 is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/9/12. (vjt)
February 27, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to the 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RD Bostic, Larry Crane, Charles A Holiday within eleven days after the entry of this Order. Pro se pltf. should also be familiar and comply with the Local Rules of this Court, as well as the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/27/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stuckey v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Crane
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles A Holiday
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RD Bostic
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearvue Opportunity IX LLC
Represented By: Daniel C. Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mickel Law Firm PA
Represented By: B. Jeffery Pence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Service Company
Represented By: B. Jeffery Pence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worsham Law Firm PA
Represented By: Richard E. Worsham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Stuckey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?