Clark v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: M Randy Rice
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Thirdparty_defendant: Gunderson Rail Services LLC
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2012cv00108
Filed: April 22, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2012 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Union Pacific's motion for attorneys' fees in the amount of $160,208.49; denying 169 Gunderson's Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 170 Gunderson's Motion for Costs; denying 175 Gunderson's Motion for Attorney Fees; denying as moot Union Pacific's Rule 58 180 Motion to Extend Time to file notice of appeal. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/6/12. (kpr)
June 8, 2012 168 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of M Randy Rice, Trustee for Jody L. Clark, in the total sum of $1,150,000, with defendants Union Pacific and Gunderson to pay equal parts 167 . Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/8/12. (kpr)
May 15, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 68 motion for partial summary judgment concerning Union Pacific's negligence; all other pending motions are denied or moot 51 54 57 59 60 62 64 67 . Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/15/12. (vjt)
April 30, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 MOTION for Melisa Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gunderson Rail Services LLC. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/30/12. (vjt)
April 24, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the time for the parties to respond to the various pending motions is hereby extended to and including 5/9/12. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/24/12. (vjt)
April 2, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Union Pacific's 40 Motion to Quash Deposition of David Lydick and for Protective Order; the deadline for filing motions is extended to 4/20/2012. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/2/12. (vjt)
February 21, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Change Venue; the Clerk is directed to transfer this action to the USDC for the Eastern District of Arkansas Western Division. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/21/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Randy Rice
Represented By: M. Randy Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Represented By: James C. Baker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Gunderson Rail Services LLC
Represented By: Scott L. Carey
Represented By: David M. Alt
Represented By: Joseph Cotten Cunningham
Represented By: Joseph P. Pozen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: James C. Baker, Jr.
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?