Beauford et al v. ActionLink LLC

Plaintiff: Jennifer Beauford, David Caffey, Steve Cox, Elaina Grauer, Richard S Levis, Richard Neidert, Jill Pate, Rene Sandoval, Jr and Cheryl Songster
Defendant: ActionLink LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv00139
Filed: March 2, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2016 206 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 205 Order entered separately today, judgment is entered in favor of Karl Adams, Samvel Davtyan, John Demian, Ryan Okimoto, Janette Reynolds, and Carolee Sabala for attorneys' fees and costs of the action in the total amount of $71,754.47 plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.58% per annum, for all of which garnishment and execution may issue. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/22/2016. (ljb)
June 14, 2016 194 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/14/2016. (ljb)
January 15, 2014 150 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Judgment is entered in favor of the thirty-nine prevailing plaintiffs against ActionLink, LLC, for attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses, in the total amount of $196,848.72 plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.13% per annum from the date of this Judgment until the Judgment is satisfied, for all of which garnishment and execution may issue. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 01/15/2014. (rhm)
October 7, 2013 127 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 113 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/7/13. (kpr)
March 27, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER finding that pltfs are nonexempt employees for FLSA purposes, and pltfs' 43 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted; denying deft's 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/27/13. (vjt)
April 6, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Joe Weiner to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for deft in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/6/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beauford et al v. ActionLink LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Beauford
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Muskheli
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Caffey
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Muskheli
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Cox
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Muskheli
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaina Grauer
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Muskheli
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard S Levis
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Muskheli
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Neidert
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Muskheli
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Pate
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Muskheli
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Sandoval, Jr
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Muskheli
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Songster
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Muskheli
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ActionLink LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?