Campbell v. Reliance Health Care Inc et al

Plaintiff: Carrolyn Campbell
Defendant: Reliance Health Care Inc, Northwest Health and Rehab Inc, Brandon Adams and Bryan Adams
Case Number: 4:2012cv00176
Filed: March 22, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2014 223 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: All of Campbell's, Bradfords, Knight's, St. John's, and Plummer's claims against all Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Hodges shall have judgment against SCNC Inc, d/b/a Spring Creek Health & Rehab for $810.6 0 with post-judgment interest to accrue at 0.11% per annum. Walters shall have judgment against OCNC, Inc. d/b/a Silver Oaks Health & Rehabilitation for $912.00 with post-judgment interest to accrue at 0.11% per annum. Riley shall have judgment against JBNC, Inc. d/b/a Ridgecrest Health and Rehabilitation for $3,108.76 with post-judgment interest to accrue at 0.11% per annum. Crow shall have judgment, jointly and severally, against Northwest Health & Rehab d/b/a Nor th Hills Life & Rehab and SCNS, Inc. d/b/a Spring Creek Health & Rehab for $313.76 with post-judgment interest to accrue at 0.11% annum. All of these Judgments are for the share of the combined reasonable attorney's fees and the costs previously awarded. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/15/2014. (jak)
October 7, 2014 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 220 Joint Motion. The Court will enter Judgment dealing with all claims and all parties in due course. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/7/2014. (jak)
September 10, 2014 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 215 Motion. All of Marlys St. John's claims against Northwest Health and Rehab Inc. d/b/a North Hills Life Care and Rehab, are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/10/2014. (jak)
August 11, 2014 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 203 Motion for Attorney Fees and as supplemented 210 . The Court awards costs in the amount of $5,700.50 and attorney's fees in the amount of $109,089.70. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/11/2014. (jak)
March 20, 2014 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying request for a telephone conference. The deadline for a stipulation or motion regarding attorney's fees related to Hodges, Walters, Riley, and Crow's claims is extended to 11 April 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/20/2014. (jak)
March 19, 2014 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint Report 196 noted and appreciated. Proposed notice and consent approved with the attached edits. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/19/2014. (jak)
March 12, 2014 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER concluding that the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over Crow's claims, except to enter Judgment and resolve any dispute about a reasonable attorney's fee and costs. The Court will enter Judgment for $313.76 of damages in due course. Crow-related fees and costs should be addressed in the stipulation or motion due by 31 March 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/12/2014. (jak)
February 13, 2014 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified 165 Motion to dismiss: Judgment will be entered for Hodges, Walters, and Riley. Stipulation on the related reasonable attorney's fee and costs, or a motion for them, due by 14 March 2014. Granting in part 158 Motio n for summary judgment on Crow's claims; Granting in part 140 Motion for conditional certification. Joint report and proposed notice due by 28 February 2014. Usable electronic lists due to Plaintiffs' counsel by 7 March 2014.The opt-in period will close 16 May 2014. 183 Motion to sever denied, but the Court will hold two trials. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/13/2014. (jak)
September 30, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 148 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 156 Motion to Withdraw Stills' second declaration and their arguments based on it. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/30/13. (kpr)
September 10, 2013 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 155 Motion to Dismiss Party. Reliance Health Care Inc. is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/10/13. (kpr)
August 27, 2013 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 151 Stipulation of Dismissal dismissing defts Brandon and Bryan Adams with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/27/13. (kpr)
July 26, 2013 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 125 Motion for Leave to File. Knight's recent motion for voluntary non-suit, No. 135, is granted. All her claims against all the Defendants are dismissed with prejudice, as she requests. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/26/13. (kpr)
March 25, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/25/13. (kpr)
September 12, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/12/12. (kpr)
August 22, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 47 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/22/12. (kpr)
July 12, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiffs to file a second amended and substituted complaint by July 19, 2012; finding as moot 27 28 31 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/12/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Reliance Health Care Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrolyn Campbell
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Represented By: William B. Ryan
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Bryce William Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Health Care Inc
Represented By: Rebecca Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Health and Rehab Inc
Represented By: Rebecca Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Adams
Represented By: Rebecca Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Adams
Represented By: Rebecca Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?