Paschal et al v. Child Development Inc et al

Plaintiff: Sadie Paschal, Penny Clark, Becca Coleman, Henrietta James, Ashley Reed, Patricia Shavers, Andrea Toney and Virginia Zermeno
Defendant: Child Development Inc, Community Development Institute Head Start, Jo Ann Williams and Lisa Barber
Case Number: 4:2012cv00184
Filed: March 26, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Prairie
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2014 139 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 137 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/10/14. (kpr)
January 9, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a status hearing by telephone on Friday, January 10, 2014, beginning at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/9/2014. (jak)
January 7, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 89 Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and granting 109 CDIHS's cross motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff's claims against CDIHS are dismissed with prejudice, and Judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/7/2014. (thd)
August 17, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 43 Motion to Dismiss Party; denying as moot 43 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 55 Motion for Leave to File second amended complaint. Plaintiffs are directed to file their second amended complaint by 8/24/12. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/17/12. (kpr)
May 11, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/11/12. (kpr)
April 25, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Deft CDHIS should file a reply to response by Wednesday, May 2, 2012. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/25/12. (kpr)
April 16, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel of record to advise the Court on who is representing the deft, Lisa Barber. Responses due by 2:00 p.m., tomorrow, April 17, 2012. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/16/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paschal et al v. Child Development Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Child Development Inc
Represented By: James E. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Development Institute Head Start
Represented By: Steven L. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Ann Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadie Paschal
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Clark
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becca Coleman
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henrietta James
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Reed
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Shavers
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Toney
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Zermeno
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?