Ault v. Baker et al

Plaintiff: Steve Ault
Defendant: Sam Baker and Gerald Robinson
Case Number: 4:2012cv00228
Filed: April 16, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The parites jointly request that the Court dismiss plaintiff's complaint with prejudice as part of a settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/07/2014. (mmd)
January 15, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this case from the trial docket for the week of February 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/15/14. (kpr)
March 27, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying defts' 13 MOTION to Set Aside Default; defts' 14 MOTION to Continue, Reschedule or Cancel Damages Hearing is denied in part and granted in part. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/27/13. (vjt)
October 31, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 13 MOTION to Set Aside Default 14 MOTION to Continue Reschedule or Cancel Damages Hearing. The Court will hear arguments on these motions at the hearing scheduled for Thursday, November 8, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4C at the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, AR 72201. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/31/12. (kpr)
September 7, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring the 8 MOTION for Default Judgment against Gerald Robinson filed by Steve Ault to the Clerk of the Court for consideration. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/7/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ault v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Ault
Represented By: Joshua D. Gillispie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?