DePriest v. Milligan

Plaintiff: Ronda DePriest
Defendant: Dennis Milligan
Case Number: 4:2012cv00235
Filed: April 19, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with the 102 Opinion and Order entered on this date. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 01/12/2015. (rhm)
July 17, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 motion to reopen and consolidate; directing the Clerk of Court to consolidate Case No. 4:14CV00037 JLH with this case pursuant to General Order 29 which provides for the assignment of consolidated cases to the judge with the lowe r case number; directing all parties to file all further pleadings in the instant case and granting 77 motion to reconsider insofar as it concerns Ms. DePriests's right to remonstrate claim against Mr. Milligan in his official capacity. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/17/2014. (rhm)
September 30, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 59 Motion to Stay; denying 26 Motion to Compel and Contempt; denying 29 Motion to Quash; denying 30 Motion to Quash; denying 33 Motion for Protect ive Order. The parties shall have 90 days from the conclusion of any additional EEOC proceedings or any final action by the EEOC to request this Court lift the stay or otherwise seek relief. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/30/13. (kpr) (Docket text modified on 10/1/2013 to correct the description of the document filed). (jak)
June 7, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Order to Quash. The Court directs plaintiff to file the appropriate motion to extend the discovery cutoff to permit plaintiff to take Mr. Meyer's deposition at a later time. The motion to quash the underlying subpoena, which the Court has not reviewed because it was not attached to Mr. Meyer's motion, is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/7/13. (kpr)
May 24, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Status Conference. The Court will conduct a status conference by telephone conference call on May 28, 2013, at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/24/13. (kpr)
April 25, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 6 Motion to Stay without prejudice to refile. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/25/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DePriest v. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda DePriest
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Represented By: Donald M. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Milligan
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?