Baldwin v. Four Seasons

Plaintiff: Sandra Baldwin
Defendant: Four Seasons
Case Number: 4:2012cv00357
Filed: June 13, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Motion to Enforce Settlement; granting 57 58 Motions to Withdraw as Attorney; denying as moot 23 Motion for Leave to File, 24 Motion for Summary Judgment and 27 Motion to Stay. Attorney Peter G. Kumpe and Marie Bernarde Miller terminated. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 05/08/2014. (rhm)
October 29, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to update Ms. Baldwin's address of record to 14624 Wilks Lane, Maumelle, Ar 72113. Ms. Baldwin's letter has been forwarded to her appointed counsel, Gail Ponder Gaines. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/29/13. (kpr)
September 10, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER amending 43 Order appointing Edward T. Oglesby. Mr. Oglesby is hereby terminated as counsel of record for plaintiff. Gail Ponder Gaines, Barber, McCaskill, Jones & Hale, P.A., 400 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2700, Little Rock, AR 72201-3414, is hereby appointed to represent Ms. Baldwin. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Mrs. Baldwin and counsel, via certified mail, a copy of this Order and a copy of Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/10/13. (kpr)
August 30, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to file this letter as a notice of change of address and update Ms. Baldwin's address accordingly. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/30/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin v. Four Seasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Seasons
Represented By: James Matthew Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?