Welsco Inc v. Brace

Plaintiff: Welsco Inc
Defendant: Mike Brace
Case Number: 4:2012cv00394
Filed: June 27, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Strike; denying 66 Motion to Exclude; denying without prejudice 94 97 100 103 106 111 Motions in Limine; and denying without prejudice 96 99 102 Motions to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 09/30/2014. (plm)
October 11, 2013 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this matter from the trial docket for the week of October 21, 2013. A new trial date will be set and an Amended Final Scheduling Order will be issued by separate order. The Court has under advisement the parties motions for summary judgment and other pending motions. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/11/13. (kpr)
October 4, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Mr. Brace's motion to compel as set forth in this order; denying 69 Welsco's motion to compel; and denying all requests for costs and fees associated with the filing of these motions. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/04/2013. (rhm)
September 12, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting hearing on 49 MOTION to Compel filed by Mike Brace for September 13, 2013, at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/12/13. (kpr)
July 12, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion for Limited Admission of William S. Hefland. Mr. Hefland shall be added as counsel of record for defendant Mike Brace. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/12/13. (kpr)
April 23, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/23/13. (kpr)
September 17, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/17/12. (kpr)
July 24, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for Expedited Discovery for the limited purpose of preparing for the preliminary injunction hearing. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/24/12. (kpr)
July 10, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice and adding, as counsel of record for Mike Brace, C. Larry Carbo, III and Julie Offerman. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/10/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welsco Inc v. Brace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welsco Inc
Represented By: Karen Turner-Fry
Represented By: David P. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Brace
Represented By: C. Larry Carbo, III
Represented By: Julie R. Offerman
Represented By: William Dean Overstreet
Represented By: John D. Pettie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?