Dorchester Minerals LP v. Chesapeake Exploration LLC

Plaintiff: Dorchester Minerals LP
Defendant: Chesapeake Exploration LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv00461
Filed: July 30, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2017 191 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying Chesapeake's 175 motion to exclude the expert testimony of Sowards and Harper; and granting Chesapeake's 183 motion to strike Soward's 2/7/2017 report. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/24/2017. (ljb)
April 27, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The motion hearing previously scheduled for Monday, April 27, 2015, is hereby cancelled. The hearing will be reset by separate notice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/27/2015. (ks)
May 2, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion for Limited Admission for Brent Andrew Kirby and John Robert Beatty to appear pro hac vice for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/2/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorchester Minerals LP v. Chesapeake Exploration LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorchester Minerals LP
Represented By: Jacqueline Forsgren Cronkhite
Represented By: Robert M. Honea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Exploration LLC
Represented By: Michelle P. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?