November 13, 2018 |
Filing
277
JUDGMENT: All claims against Chesapeake Energy are dismissed with prejudice. All claims against XTO Energy Inc., are dismissed without prejudice. All claims against Southwestern Energy Company and Seeco, Inc., by Robbie and Gwenna Hill, Joseph and Ca therine Smith, Kathy Hamilton, and Larry and Margaret King are dismissed with prejudice. All of Dale and Kari Stroud's claims against Southwestern Energy Company and Seeco, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice based on the remaining parties' stipulation. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/13/2018. (jak)
|
August 10, 2018 |
Filing
273
ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the 8/10/2018 hearing the Court resolves the parties' joint reports, 250 and 259 , as directed from the bench. A Sixth Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/10/2018. (jak)
|
August 3, 2018 |
Filing
271
ORDER: Pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes Tim Holton, Adam Holton, Michele Blythe, Billy Dixon, Michael Morfey, and Expert Pat Hollister to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant in the Little Rock U.S. Courthouse on 8/10/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/3/2018. (jak)
|
July 27, 2018 |
Filing
269
ORDER: The Court received the attached letter from the Defendants' counsel. There's no need for the Defendants to retain an e-discovery consultant for the upcoming hearing. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/27/2018. (jak)
|
July 3, 2018 |
Filing
268
ORDER denying without prejudice as premature 264 Motion for summary judgment. 267 Motion for extension is denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/3/2018. (jak)
|
May 18, 2018 |
Filing
260
ORDER suspending the 226 Fifth Amended Final Scheduling Order. The Court will hold a hearing at 10:00 a.m. on 8/10/2018 in Little Rock to resolve all pending discovery disputes. Defendants must file an electronic copy of materials they have produced under seal by 6/15/2018, with a courtesy electronic copy delivered to chambers. Simultaneous 10 page briefs due by 6/29/2018. Motions No. 248 and 252 denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/18/2018. (jak)
|
April 26, 2018 |
Filing
247
ORDER denying without prejudice 237 Motion as moot and with the caveats specified in this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/26/2018. (jak)
|
January 29, 2018 |
Filing
233
ORDER granting 231 Motion. Joint report with a proposed alternative to the Teff deposition due by 2/2/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/29/2018. (jak)
|
December 18, 2017 |
Filing
223
ORDER: Joint reports No. 194 , No. 200 , and No. 210 addressed. The 203 Motion to strike is denied. Proposed new deadlines due by 12/20/2017. Supplemental responses from both sides due by 1/16/2018. Plaintiffs must complete the two Court-ordered depositions by 1/31/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/18/2017. (jak)
|
October 17, 2017 |
Filing
205
ORDER granting 195 Motion. The document issues need resolution before more Defendants' witnesses are deposed. The 10/30/2017 discovery deadline is suspended. Joint report listing remaining disputes due by 10/31/2017. On a mutually convenient date thereafter, the Court will hold a hearing on disputed issues and the new motion for sanctions, No. 203 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/17/2017. (jak)
|
June 13, 2017 |
Filing
181
ORDER: The Court has received the Judgment and Mandate from the Court of Appeals, 179 & 180 . The Court would appreciate, and benefit from, the parties' suggestion on a schedule for handling the case. Please confer, and if there is a mutually acceptable plan, file a joint report explaining it by 6/28/2017. If there is a disagreement, file separate status reports by that date. The Court will hold a status conference, if need be, thereafter. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/13/2017. (jak)
|
September 25, 2015 |
Filing
172
JUDGMENT: The civil Rico, civil conspiracy, breach of contract, breach of the covenant of good faith and fair dealing, conversion, and Arkansas Deceptive Trade Practices Act claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Strouds' remaining claims a re dismissed with prejudice. The remaining claims of Robbie and Gwenna Hill, Joseph and Catherine Smith, Kathy Hamilton, and Larry and Margaret King are dismissed with prejudice. The remaining claims of Beverly Strain Eads, Randy and Joyce Palmer, and Jerry Van Wormer are dismissed with prejudice. The remaining claims of Corey and Julie Warden, Bradley and Crystal Hooper, and Adam Kofoid are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/25/2015. (jak)
|
November 6, 2014 |
Filing
147
ORDER terminating all plaintiffs except Dale and Kari Stroud. The Court directs the Clerk to so note in the docket. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/6/2014. (jak)
|
November 5, 2014 |
Filing
144
ORDER directing the parties to identify any AOGC or ADEQ document on which they intend to rely in phase 1 that was not produced in connection with an expert or otherwise identified in response to discovery by 14 November 2014. Identification, not pro duction, is all that's required. The April 2015 trial date is cancelled. Counsel should hold 23 March 2015 at 9:00 a.m. for a hearing on phase 1 motions and the week of 10 August 2015 for trial. The parties should advise the Court as to the status of plaintiffs Jerry Van Wormer, Randy Palmer, Joyce Palmer, Adam Kofoid, Bradley Hopper, Crystal Hopper, Corey Warden, Julie Warden, and Beverly Strain Eads. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/5/2014. (jak)
|
August 27, 2014 |
Filing
130
ORDER noting the parties' 129 Stipulation. All Plaintiffs' claims against XTO Energy, Inc are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/27/2014. (jak)
|
August 12, 2014 |
Filing
127
ORDER denying the request for production of background information. Plaintiffs can explore these issues in detail during deposition. Request for extension of deadlines denied: the parties must find a mutually convenient date for the deposition on the current timetable. The Court has just amended the Scheduling Order and declines to do so again absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/12/2014. (jak)
|
June 12, 2014 |
Filing
119
ORDER granting 118 Motion. All claims against Chesapeake Energy are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/12/2014. (jak)
|
February 14, 2014 |
Filing
107
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 97 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/14/2014. (jak)
|
February 12, 2014 |
Filing
106
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/12/2014. (ks)
|
December 10, 2013 |
Filing
87
ORDER granting 77 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/10/13. (kpr)
|
November 15, 2013 |
Filing
81
ORDER re 75 Notice (Other), 77 MOTION for Joinder of Required Party and Stay of Discovery filed by Southwestern Energy Company, 76 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Southwestern Energy Company, XTO Energy, Chesapeake Energy. Parties should make initial disclosure by 11/27/2013. A hearing will be set by separate notice. Discovery should proceed in the meantime. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/15/2013. (rhm)
|
September 26, 2013 |
Filing
69
ORDER granting motion to amend, as modified 65 . Motions to dismiss, No. 23 (as amended), 33 41 granted except on the trespass and unjust-enrichment claims and the class-certification issue, which isn't ripe yet. All the dismissals are without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/26/13. (kpr)
|