Watkins et al v. Arkansas, State of et al

Plaintiff: Timothy Watkins
Defendant: Arkansas, State of, Keith Rhodes, Brad Perkins, Hazen District Court, Billy's Trucking and David Smith
Case Number: 4:2012cv00555
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2015 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk of Court must reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/10/2015. (jak)
February 10, 2015 131 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: All Watkins's claims against Billy's Trucking, Brad Perkins, and David Smith are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/10/2015. (jak)
January 14, 2015 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding Watkins's motion for summary judgment as incomplete. He must file a separate statement of undisputed material facts. Watkins's statement is due by 21 January 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/14/2015. (jak)
December 23, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Billy's Trucking's motion for summary judgment, 95 , on all Watkins's claims against the towing company. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/23/2014. (jak)
November 25, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Billy's Trucking to supplement its exhibits with a complete condensed copy of Watkins's deposition. Billy's Truckings' supplement due 2 December 2014. Watkins must file a substituted responding statement of material facts that conforms to the Court's Amended Final Scheduling Order. Watkins's substituted responding statement due 10 December 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/25/2014. (jak)
November 10, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel for Perkins and Smith, counsel for Billy's Trucking, and Watkins to meet and confer by telephone and attempt to resolve any remaining discovery disputes. Joint report due by 19 November 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/10/2014. (jak)
May 9, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 88 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/9/2014. (jak)
March 18, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion to Strike. Watkins's response to BIlly's Trucking's 69 Answer, is stricken as unnecessary and because it was filed without permission. The Final Scheduling Order is vacated. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. The Court directs Billy's Trucking and Watkins to exchange initial disclosures, FED. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), by 31 March 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/18/2014. (jak)
February 20, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare and deliver a summons, along with a copy of 62 Order and 67 Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service on Brad Perkins and David Smith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/20/2014. (jak)
January 15, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 54 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 56 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 57 Motion for Judgment. Second amended complaint is due by January 31st. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/15/14. (kpr)
August 27, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion for Ruling. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/27/2013. (fcd)
July 17, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and holding in abeyance in part 29 Motion for Order for relief; and denying 30 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's 20 Order. The Court will hold a hearing on 1 August 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom B155 o f the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States District Court. Both parties must attend. The Court directs the Clerk to enter a default. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this Order via certified mail, return receipt requested, to Billy's Trucking, P.O. Box 696, Hazen, AR 72064-0696. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/17/13. (kpr) (Modified on 7/17/2013 to correct typographical error). (vjt)
March 14, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 Order directing plaintiff to provide an address for Billy's Trucking. The Court directs Watkins to provide a specific address for Billy's Trucking by 4/19/13. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/14/13. (kpr)
February 7, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 16 Order of December 7, 2012. The Court directs the Clerk to correct the docket sheet by docketing Watkins's materials separately as a response to Perkins and Smiths's motion to dismiss. The materials were attached, mistakenly, to the Order of December 7, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/7/13. (kpr)
December 7, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to file the documents and video sent to chambers by the plaintiff. In the future, Watkins must file all submissions with the Clerk, not mail them to chambers. If Watkins has retained counsel, counsel should file an appearance immediately. If counsel would like to view the video, they may come to the Court and do so. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/7/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins et al v. Arkansas, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazen District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy's Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?