Schaffhauser v. United Parcel Service Inc

Plaintiff: Chris Schaffhauser
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv00599
Filed: September 21, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 80 Order and Opinion entered on January 15, 2014. This case is dismissed with prejudice and the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/21/14. (kpr)
January 15, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting defendant's 41 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing Mr. Schaffhauser's race discrimination and failure to accommodate claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/15/14. (kpr)(Docket text modified on 1/16/2014 to correct the description of the document filed). (jak)
December 16, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 52 Telephone Conference regarding Chris Schaffhauser's deposition of Stefond Harris. Mr. Harris shall be deposed on Friday, December 20, 2013, beginning at 1:00 p.m.. Mr. Schaffhauser shall have up to and including Monday, Decemb er 23, 2013, to file his response to defendants motion for summary judgment. The Court will allow plaintiff to include in his response matters from the deposition he believes pertinent and then later supplement his response with relevant portions of the transcript when it becomes available. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/16/13. (kpr)
December 13, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a telephone hearing for today, Friday, 12/13/2013, beginning at 3:00 p.m., regarding plaintiff Chris Schaffhauser's deposition of Stefond Harris. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/13/2013. (rhm)
December 11, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion for Order granting leave to file notice of telephone deposition. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/11/13. (kpr)
November 12, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER based on the hearing conducted on November 6, 2013, regarding plaintiff's deposition of third-party Rodney Barefield. Lucien Gillham, Mr. Barefield's counsel, may make proper objections and take action consistent with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and controlling case law during the deposition of his client. If questions or issues arise during the deposition,counsels are directed to contact the Court. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/12/13. (kpr)
November 5, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting telephone hearing for Wednesday, November 6, 2013, beginning at 9:30 a.m., regarding plaintiff's deposition of Rodney Barefield. Mr. Barefield's deposition, currently scheduled for Wednesday, November 6, 2013, at 1:30 p.m., will be postponed to a date and time to be set at the hearing. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/5/13. (kpr)
April 4, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/4/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaffhauser v. United Parcel Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Schaffhauser
Represented By: James H. Penick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc
Represented By: Marcus M. Crider
Represented By: Maralee M. Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?