Ballard et al v. Ziperski et al

Plaintiff: M Melinda Ballard and Marie-Louise Ramsdale
Defendant: Robyn B Ziperski and Delta Trust & Bank
Case Number: 4:2012cv00637
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 98 Order. Judge Brantley is discharged as R.C.A.'s guardian, and the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/28/13. (kpr)
October 17, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal 97 ; granting 92 93 Motions for Attorney Fees; and dismissing all claims without prejudice. The Court will discharge the guardian and enter judgment on 25 October 2013 unless some party requests some other relief before then. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/17/13. (kpr)
September 10, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ms. Ballard's claims are dismissed without prejudice. The guardian for R.C.A. is directed to report to the Court by September 25, 2013, whether R.C.A. intends to pursue this case. Any motion t o be paid for time spent or expenses incurred since appointment is due by the same date. If R.C.A.' s guardian fails to report by the deadline, the Court will dismiss R.C.A.' s claims without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/10/13. (kpr)
June 20, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting 55 Motion to Appoint guardian ad litem ad Litem. Ellen Brantley appointed as guardian ad litem for R.C.A.; finding as moot 57 Motion for Relief; finding as moot 62 Motion to Appoint guardian ad litem ad Litem. denying 78 Motion for Attorney Fees without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/20/13. (kpr)
October 11, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 9 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 21 Motion to Dismiss. The court transfers this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. The clerk's office is directed to transmit the complete record in this case to that district. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/11/12. (juwo) [Transferred from scd on 10/12/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballard et al v. Ziperski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn B Ziperski
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Trust & Bank
Represented By: Michael Norris Shannon
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Melinda Ballard
Represented By: Robert E. Sumner, IV
Represented By: Trudy Hartzog Robertson
Represented By: J. David Crisp
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie-Louise Ramsdale
Represented By: Marie-Louise Ramsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?