In Re Charles Dawson Matthews

Case Number: 4:2012mc00004
Filed: February 9, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER 20 directing the Clerk of the Court to disburse money from the Library Fund in the amount of $843.75 to pay witness fees for the appearance of witness Len W. Bradley. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/9/12. (kpr)
July 18, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Attorney Fees and directing the Clerk to disburse money from the Library Fund in the amount of $7,900.00 to Bruce R. Wilson. A copy of this Order, together with the application, shall be placed in the Library Fund file maintained by the Clerk. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/18/12. (kpr)
June 19, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 1 Petition for Reinstatement filed by Charles Dawson Matthews is GRANTED; the Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/19/12. (vjt)
February 16, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to Stark Ligon and Benjamin C. McMinn re Charles Dawnson Matthews. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/16/12. (kpr) Modified on 2/16/2012 to correct typographical error (kpr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Charles Dawson Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?