Best v. Holladay et al

Plaintiff: Roxanne Best
Defendant: Charles Holladay, Carl Johnson, Randy Morgan and John Does
Case Number: 4:2013cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion. All of Best's federal law claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Court declines jurisdiction over the remaining pendent state-law claims, 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c). The Court remands those claims to the Pulaski County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/21/2014. (jak)
February 28, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion to Withdraw. 20 Motion for Summary Judgment withdrawn. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/28/2014. (jak)
February 20, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER grating 38 Motion for Voluntary dismissal. Best's claims against Rachel Holmes, R. Hale, and Maxim Healthcare Services Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. The unopposed 40 Motion for Extension is granted. Dr. Johnson's reply due by 7 March 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/20/2014 (jak)
October 9, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Stay ddl for responding to Dr. Johnson's motion for summary judgment 20 until December 16, 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/9/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best v. Holladay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Best
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Holladay
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Johnson
Represented By: Kevin M. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Morgan
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?