Longoria v. Edwards et al

Plaintiff: Michael James Longoria
Defendant: Tiffany Zomont, Lynn Ollar, Edwards, Varnell, Jeff Longley, Hill, S Mayhve, Stephen Reed, Does, Barron Dickson and Robin Steele
Case Number: 4:2013cv00059
Filed: February 5, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with 95 Order, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/5/2015. (ljb)
August 7, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file, within 30 days of this Order, a Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 86 and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts as set forth in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timel y and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/07/2014. (kcs)
January 15, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's claims against defendants Steele and Mayhue pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2)(v). Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/15/2014. (jak)
December 24, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 73 Defendants' Motion to Compel. Plaintiff must within 14 days of the entry of this Order, file his Answers to Defendant Steele's and Mayhue's 8/5/2013 Interrogatories and Requests for Production. Plaintiff is advised that if he fails to timely and properly do so, his claims against Defendants Steele and Mayhue will be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2)(v). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/24/2013. (kcs)
September 3, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file, within 30 days a Response to 51 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss and alternatively, for summary judgment and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the Fed.R.Civ.P.56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions in this Order. Plaintiff's failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(c); or (b) the dismissal of his claims against Defendants Ollar and the U. S. Marshal's Service, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/03/2013. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longoria v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Zomont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Ollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Longley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Mayhve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barron Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?