Mahan et al v. Chesapeake Operating Inc et al

Defendant: Chesapeake Operating Inc and BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC
Plaintiff: Mary Mahan, Mark Mahan, Wendy Mahan and Norman Mahan
Case Number: 4:2013cv00184
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/20/2014. (ks)
March 12, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER/ORDER to counsel regarding the necessity of more information before ruling on 40 Joint Motion. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/12/2014. (jak)
August 20, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER transferring the claims of Jesse and Susan Frey to Case No. 4:13CV00184; severing Case No. 4:11CV00475 from Case No. 4:11CV00474; and consolidating Case No. 4:11CV00475 with this case. (Order docketed in Case Nos. 4:11CV00474 & 4:11CV00475). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/20/2013. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahan et al v. Chesapeake Operating Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating Inc
Represented By: Adria W. Conklin
Represented By: Michelle P. Cullen
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Mahan
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Sean Fletcher Rommel
Represented By: James Clark Wyly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Mahan
Represented By: James Clark Wyly
Represented By: Sean Fletcher Rommel
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Mahan
Represented By: James Clark Wyly
Represented By: Sean Fletcher Rommel
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Mahan
Represented By: James Clark Wyly
Represented By: Sean Fletcher Rommel
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?